THE OAKES TRUST (SHEFFIELD)

Charity number: 1064155
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate Fehler Trustee 18 May 2020
CHC EVANGELISM TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Stephen James Wilkinson Trustee 16 March 2019 None on record
ANTHONY FISHER Trustee None on record
JO HOPKINS Trustee 24 January 2013
THE CAMBRIAN COAST EVANGELICAL TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Paul German Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record
Ian Alastair Burton Trustee 16 November 2019 None on record
Helen Catherine Harvey Trustee 16 November 2019 None on record