Trustees BEAVERS ARTS LIMITED
Charity number: 1068736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Melisse Amanda Scott | Chair | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sujen Walker | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kelly Prince | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathy James-Castle | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RENNIE | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.