THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1062764
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MS Zeinab Bedawi Chair 26 June 2014
THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
BBC MEDIA ACTION Charity reporting is up to date
MARY KINGSLEY ZOCHONIS LECTURE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
INNES DAVID KINGSLEY MEEK Trustee None on record
GREGORY LENNOX TORGEIR KRONSTEN Trustee 26 June 2014 None on record
Geetha Tharmaratnam Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
SUSANA RADEGUNDA EDJANG MANGUE Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER CRAMER Trustee None on record
Joel Kibazo Trustee
ONE WORLD MEDIA TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
EDUCATION SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA Charity reporting is up to date
CHILD'S - I FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
SERIOUS TRUST LIMITED
THE MVULE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
FRANCIS WEBOKO INYUNDO Trustee 28 June 2016 None on record
Andrew David Skipper Trustee 11 June 2020 None on record
RAZIA KHAN Trustee 08 October 2012 None on record
Lindsay Northover Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
BABAJIDE HUSSEIN KEHINDE OLANREWAJU Trustee 08 October 2012 None on record
Dr TITILOLA BANJOKO Trustee 05 March 2013
TROPICAL HEALTH AND EDUCATION TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN'S HEALTH RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT Charity reporting is up to date
INTERNATIONAL RESCUE COMMITTEE, U.K Charity reporting is up to date
Obinne Noora Felicia James Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
Anne McCormick Trustee 28 June 2016 None on record
NIKE JONAH Trustee 30 April 2018
ALTERNATIVE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
BIRMINGHAM CONTEMPORARY MUSIC GROUP Charity reporting is up to date
Myles Antony Wickstead Trustee 30 April 2019
BBC MEDIA ACTION Charity reporting is up to date
JOFFE CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
JOFFE CHARITABLE TRUST CIO Charity reporting is up to date