Royal Academy Trust

Charity number: 1067270
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUZANNE HEYWOOD Trustee 13 January 2014
ROYAL OPERA HOUSE COVENT GARDEN FOUNDATION
ADRIAN CHENG Trustee 12 July 2013 None on record
PETR AVEN Trustee 12 March 2014 None on record
Sir Lloyd Dorfman Trustee 13 January 2014
PRINCE'S TRUST INTERNATIONAL Charity reporting is up to date
THE DORFMAN FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Ayreh Bourkoff Trustee 17 April 2019 None on record
Scott Mead Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
ROBERT WILLIAM GUY YERBURGH Trustee 22 June 2020
CENTREPOINT SOHO Charity reporting is up to date
RICHARD CHANG Trustee 10 December 2010 None on record
Batia Ofer Trustee 17 April 2019 None on record
Dame Carolyn Julia McCall DBE Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Lady Alison Myners Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
Peter Rowland Tudor St John Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record
ANDREA WONG Trustee 31 October 2016
THE BRITISH FILM INSTITUTE Charity reporting is up to date
CLIVE HUMBY Trustee 31 October 2016
THE EDWINA DUNN AND CLIVE HUMBY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY Charity reporting is up to date
SIAN WESTERMAN Trustee 12 March 2014 None on record
ROBERT SUSS Trustee 03 August 2014 None on record
Lady Alison Deighton Trustee 31 October 2016
THE ROYAL BALLET Charity reporting is up to date
Axel Ruger Trustee 29 May 2019
THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY Charity reporting is up to date
Ina Sandmann Trustee 07 September 2020 None on record
PESH FRAMJEE Trustee 26 August 2020
NATURE STEWARDSHIP ALLIANCE CIO Charity reporting is up to date
INSTITUTE OF CONTEMPORARY ARTS LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
THE RESOURCE ALLIANCE LIMITED
Rebecca Salter PRA Trustee 10 December 2019
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS Charity reporting is up to date
THE CHANTREY BEQUEST Charity reporting is up to date
Varun Chandra Trustee 23 September 2020
AFGHAN CONNECTION Charity reporting is up to date
Melanie Clore Trustee 22 June 2017 None on record
Duro Olowu Trustee 17 April 2019 None on record
STEPHEN GOSZTONY Trustee 26 August 2020
SIR JOHN SOANE'S MUSEUM Charity reporting is up to date
MASTER FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF PEMBROKE COLLEGE Charity reporting is up to date
STEPHEN FRY Trustee 26 June 2007
THE CRITERION THEATRE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Christina Ong Trustee 24 June 2015 None on record