WAI YIN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1073437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download