AMBITIOUS ABOUT AUTISM

Charity number: 1063184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download