AMBITIOUS ABOUT AUTISM

Charity number: 1063184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL DISLEY-TINDELL Trustee 18 July 2013 None on record
Jonathan Andrews Trustee 27 June 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Stanton BSC ACA Trustee 26 September 2014
THE ALDE & ORE ESTUARY TRUST Received: On time
CRANLEIGH SCHOOL Received: On time
Lesley Longstone Trustee 26 September 2014 None on record
Alistair MacCallum Trustee 07 October 2019 None on record
NEIL GOULDEN Chair 05 December 2014
ST CHRISTOPHERS HOSPICE Received: 22 days late
GAMESYS FOUNDATION Recently registered
COMMITTEE OF UNIVERSITY CHAIRS Recently registered