Accounts and annual returns AYLESBURY VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1064215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 February 2019 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 February 2019 106 days late Download Open in new window