AYLESBURY VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1064215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Jane Michel Trustee 09 June 2020 None on record
Elizabeth N Cartwright Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
Paul Gunasalvam Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Georgia Anna Gasson Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Richard Snaith Trustee 15 December 2017
REFUGEE COMPASSION Received: On time
James Andrew Tweats Chair 06 September 2020 None on record