Financial history AYLESBURY VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity number: 1064215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £357.00k £585.43k £663.96k £554.22k £752.63k
Total expenditure £303.91k £508.98k £679.10k £490.18k £799.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £8.00k N/A N/A £39.43k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £577.54k £646.68k £546.94k £749.55k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £6.58k £16.86k £5.54k £2.81k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.27k £374 £1.72k £257
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £44 £43 £29 £14
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £508.98k £679.10k £490.18k £799.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £5.52k £5.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0