Accounts and annual returns THE YORK EARLY MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1068331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window