Financial history THE YORK EARLY MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1068331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £816.79k £855.83k £992.44k £700.23k £683.23k
Total expenditure £854.86k £836.14k £819.12k £633.23k £749.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.91k £299.87k £443.26k £68.82k £63.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £58.67k £54.84k £79.75k £74.61k £48.75k
Income - Other trading activities £167.91k £179.78k £134.35k £33.49k £113.21k
Income - Charitable activities £586.20k £616.44k £773.13k £570.79k £513.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k £1.77k £2.21k £1.59k £1.02k
Income - Other £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £19.75k £6.39k
Income - Legacies £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £752.73k £753.48k £739.83k £611.50k £691.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds £102.13k £82.67k £79.29k £21.74k £57.73k
Expenditure - Governance £5.45k £9.59k £6.53k £6.09k £7.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £18.00k £33.75k £33.75k £31.50k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0