Trustees THE YORK EARLY MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1068331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL MARTIN MURPHY Chair
None on record
Reverend Canon Dr Victoria Louise Johnson Trustee 24 September 2021
ST.PETER'S SCHOOL, YORK
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN EVIDENCE SOCIETY (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Anita Datta Trustee 24 September 2021
None on record
Simon Andrew Robert Procter Trustee 17 December 2020
None on record
Paul Alexander Tyack Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record
MARTIN STANCLIFFE Trustee 20 December 2017
None on record
Menna McGregor Trustee 17 December 2014
ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
J. EDWARD CONWAY FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL
Received: 5 days late
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER FOX Trustee
YORK EARLY MUSIC FESTIVALS LIMITED
Received: On time