Trustees THE CHARITY OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF ARBITRATORS

Charity number: 1069939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL ROSE Chair 28 October 2014
THE ROSE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CENTRE FOR PEACEFUL SOLUTIONS
Received: On time
Dr Christopher McArdle Trustee 27 October 2021
None on record
Kay Linnell Trustee 13 July 2021
None on record
Lucy Anne Keane Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
MARTYN HENRY STEWART BRADISH Trustee 24 October 2019
THE ENDOWMENT FUND OF THE SCHOOLS OF QUEEN ELIZABETH THE FIRST, BARNET
Received: On time
THE SPECIAL PRIZES AND AWARDS FUND
Received: On time
David William Steward Trustee 17 October 2019
None on record
Anthony Michael Nixon Trustee 22 April 2015
None on record