Trustees JULIA'S HOUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1067125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN JOHN PARKER Chair 06 February 2020
None on record
SAMANTHA JANE TUCKER Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
JACQUELINE JEAN IRVINE Trustee 27 May 2021
None on record
JUSTIN PAUL KLINE Trustee 04 February 2021
None on record
BARBARA ANN BAKER Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
SARAH ELLIOTT Trustee 06 July 2020
None on record
KAREN DOROTHY GLASTONBURY Trustee 06 February 2020
None on record
MARK WILLIAM NIXON Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
PETER GRAHAM WRAGG Trustee 26 July 2017
None on record
Brian Hutchinson Trustee 16 April 2015
SAFEWISE
Charity is in administration