Trustees MILLENNIUM FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1070145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Massey Chair 03 July 2018
None on record
Peter Robert Easton Turner Trustee 02 October 2020
None on record
Helen Wilson Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record
Amanda Jane O'Neill Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
LOUISA WELLS Trustee 25 January 2012
None on record
ANDREW MARSHALL HUNTER Trustee
None on record
NICOLA ANNE HUNTER Trustee
None on record