THE WESTMORLAND COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1067224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 21 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 19 September 2018 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 03 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 31 August 2017 On time Download