THE WESTMORLAND COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1067224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil John Sowerby Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
LISA DAWN BENNETT Chair 21 February 2012 None on record
Ian Kenneth Grisedale Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
Peter Cummings Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
David Hall Fell Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record
Jacqueline Lesley Holmes Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
Margaret Kelly Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
PAUL ANTHONY DUCKETT Trustee 21 February 2012 None on record
JAMES ANTHONY DIXON Trustee 19 February 2013 None on record
MATTHEW HAROLD ROBINSON Trustee 21 February 2018
OLD HUTTON MOLE FUND Received: On time
DAVID ROBERT MARTIN Trustee 20 February 2014 None on record
Jonathan Charles Mason Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record