ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY BERKS/ HANTS/ SURREY BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 1067776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mervyn Clarence Short Trustee 04 June 2012 None on record
Judith Wendy Muir Trustee 22 May 2019 None on record
Sarah Whillis Trustee 23 May 2018 None on record
Christine Anne Knox Trustee 16 September 2020
CROWTHORNE CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Thomas Knox Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Catherine Robertson Smith Trustee 20 May 2015 None on record
Anne Jean Carter Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Fiona Jane Albinson Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Phillipa Claire Peatman Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Deborah Irene Draffin Trustee 21 May 2014 None on record