THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BRUTON SOMERSET

Charity number: 1085782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISTAIR PEARCE Trustee 30 June 2014 None on record
HARRY EDWIN VALLANCE MILLS Chair 28 April 2013 None on record
STEPHEN LEE Trustee 11 May 2017 None on record
Peter John Reynolds Trustee 27 February 2020 None on record
JOHN HENRY BISHTON Trustee
BRUTON CONSERVATION TRUST Received: On time
MRS JULIET BOWELL Trustee 18 May 2015 None on record