Financial history WE ARE IVE LTD

Charity number: 1074583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.46m £1.40m £1.54m £1.66m £1.49m
Total expenditure £1.41m £1.49m £1.45m £1.54m £1.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.03m
Income from government grants £1.09m £1.09m £1.10m £88.28k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.45m £16.86k £0 £10.98k £77
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.38m £1.54m £1.57m £1.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £1.54k £1.74k £857 £857
Income - Other £1.23k £0 £4.65k £78.61k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.33m £1.27m £1.47m £1.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £22.90k £34.73k £69.68k £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.41k £16.43k £11.05k £21.41k £26.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £239.19k £226.19k £1.23m £171.63k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £14.64k £132.48k £144.14k £0 £0