ROYAL WEST OF ENGLAND ACADEMY

Charity number: 1070163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £856.62k £797.34k £777.36k £845.44k £1.19m
Total expenditure £818.21k £819.88k £843.47k £828.16k £995.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.99k £20.99k £18.74k £12.00k £261.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £413.06k £209.22k £173.36k £172.86k £474.27k
Income - Other trading activities £33.17k £32.91k £37.74k £46.02k £96.14k
Income - Charitable activities £392.57k £536.11k £548.12k £604.88k £597.53k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.82k £19.11k £18.14k £21.67k £19.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £756.79k £733.18k £752.40k £744.48k £900.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.55k £63.74k £91.06k £62.13k £94.94k
Expenditure - Governance £15.13k £16.00k £6.91k £5.89k £7.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £864 £11.20k £4.78k £0 £7.08k
Expenditure - Other £14.88k £22.96k £0 £21.55k £0