Financial history THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY, SOUTH WALES BRANCH

Charity number: 1069188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £5.18k £5.15k £5.11k £4.23k £1.04k
Total expenditure £4.62k £6.23k £5.67k £5.27k £1.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A