Financial history TAMESIDE SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1074808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.01m £11.28m £12.82m £9.76m £11.37m
Total expenditure £11.33m £12.83m £13.22m £10.82m £14.75m
Income from government contracts £2.41m £1.02m £1.92m £2.42m £2.49m
Income from government grants £210.25k £283.76k £218.15k £2.72m £148.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.50m £9.78m £11.42m £8.69m £10.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.50m £1.50m £1.40m £1.08m £927.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.33m £12.83m £13.22m £10.82m £12.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.10m
Expenditure - Governance £12.50k £12.50k £12.50k £12.50k £12.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.10m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0