Trustees TAMESIDE SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1074808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michaela Bowker Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Cllr Denise Ann Ward Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Chris Easton Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Victoria Moores Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Julian Dominic Sexton Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
David Wadsworth Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Daniel Clark Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Martin Nield Trustee 02 January 2018
None on record
JON KEATING Trustee 26 September 2013
None on record