HOPE CHURCH ROTHERHAM

Charity number: 1069689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £135.99k £163.49k £154.38k £184.88k £242.92k
Total expenditure £143.87k £152.26k £149.42k £166.54k £183.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A