HOPE CHURCH ROTHERHAM

Charity number: 1069689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY EASTWOOD Trustee None on record
Paul Cunningham Trustee 30 July 2018 None on record
HANNAH LAMBERT Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
ANDREW HARRIS Trustee 27 November 2013 None on record
John Bradwell Trustee 30 July 2018 None on record
Paul Morris Trustee 25 March 2019 None on record
Peter Shaw Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record