Financial history WEST HEATH 2000

Charity number: 1069677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £8.32m £8.61m £8.60m £9.82m £9.52m
Total expenditure £7.60m £8.30m £8.39m £8.87m £9.09m
Income from government contracts £7.74m £7.98m £8.13m £9.31m £8.95m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £347.07k £374.51k £399.45k £378.00k £418.81k
Income - Other trading activities £230.65k £247.85k £56.23k £129.02k £142.99k
Income - Charitable activities £7.74m £7.98m £8.13m £9.31m £8.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.23k £10.06k £9.55k £1.98k £2.66k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.45m £8.14m £8.35m £8.87m £9.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £142.65k £160.15k £40.94k £1.49k £67.96k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0