BBC MEDIA ACTION

Charity number: 1076235
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavin Alexander Mann Trustee 10 July 2017 None on record
Richard William Dawkins Trustee 01 July 2015 None on record
Julia Ruth Rank Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Professor Myles Antony Wickstead Trustee 12 July 2019
JOFFE CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
JOFFE CHARITABLE TRUST CIO Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
ZEINAB MOHAMMED-KHAIR BADAWI-MALIK Trustee 17 October 2016
THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
MARY KINGSLEY ZOCHONIS LECTURE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL AFRICAN SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
Nicholas James Pickles Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Francesca Mary Unsworth Trustee 17 October 2014 None on record
Shirley Cameron Trustee 12 July 2019
HANSARD SOCIETY LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
MICHAEL JAMES WOOLDRIDGE Trustee 01 July 2015
WOMA WORLD OF MUSIC AND ARTS ASSIST Charity reporting is up to date
Sophia Swithern Trustee 18 January 2017 None on record
Awo Selasi Ablo Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record