Trustees DEVON ARTS IN SCHOOLS INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1071762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lilian Helen John Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Sally Maria Clements Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Holly Morwenna Rawlings Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Robert Charles Passmore Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Meg Chaplin Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Lisa Jane Howard Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Hannah Khatib Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Nicholas Edward Dixon Hoste Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
Clair McColl Trustee 10 September 2019
ARTSREACH
Received: On time
CHANGING KEY DORSET
Recently registered
Caroline Emma Sparke Trustee 23 July 2019
None on record
Diana Johnson Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Paul Leyland Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
ROGER KIRK Trustee
None on record