Accounts and annual returns DEVON ARTS IN SCHOOLS INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1071762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window