Accounts and annual returns DOWNING COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window