COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £39.94m £41.60m £44.46m £46.81m £50.84m
Total expenditure £39.36m £40.67m £43.82m £46.40m £48.90m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £158.00k £322.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £39.67m £41.24m £44.06m £46.55m £50.78m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £260.00k £351.00k £381.00k £221.00k £52.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.00k £10.00k £26.00k £15.00k £1.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £24.00k £0
Income - Legacies £252.00k £221.00k £168.00k £151.00k £320.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £35.01m £35.73m £38.80m £40.83m £45.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.35m £4.93m £5.02m £5.58m £3.58m
Expenditure - Governance £17.00k £23.00k £26.00k £17.00k £79.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £30.31m £30.76m £33.11m £34.99m £38.93m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0