Trustees COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERTRAM SINNIAH Chair 14 June 2019
None on record
TIMOTHY MALTON Trustee 10 November 2023
PEMBROKE TRUST
Overdue by 29 days
DAVID STEINEGGER Trustee 10 November 2023
THE STONE FAMILY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anthonia Adesola Irukwu Trustee 03 March 2023
BRIGHT FUTURES FOR AFRICAN CHILDREN
Received: On time
Fiona Joy Sellers Trustee 03 March 2023
None on record
Hedy Hodson Trustee 16 October 2020
None on record
Dr Anna Maslin Trustee 06 March 2020
None on record
Dr Richmond Wandera Trustee 18 October 2019
None on record
DELFIN POSADA Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record