SCENE AND HEARD

Charity number: 1077836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emily Giselle Plosker Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
David Stewart Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
KEITH DAVID ACKERMAN Chair 14 February 2012 None on record
John Morris Eric Rolph Trustee 10 September 2018 None on record
JOHN NEVIN Trustee 15 September 2015
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION Received: On time
PEMBROKE COLLEGE SETTLEMENT Received: On time
Joanne Millard Trustee 13 February 2014
ARTIS FOUNDATION Received: On time
Anthony Obiezekpazu Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Bronagh McCann Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Emma Jane Bell Trustee 16 November 2017 None on record
Andrew Porter Trustee 29 January 2015 None on record
WILLIAM MUIR WHARFE Trustee None on record
Tracey Bernadette Mullett Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record