Trustees COUNCIL FOR DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 1079153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger John Lawrence Bramble MA DL Chair
None on record
Abigail Morris Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Tim Lewis Bennett-Hart Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Julie Suzanne Williamson Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
John Gardyne Trustee 11 October 2018
None on record
Annette Pearson Trustee 08 October 2015
None on record
Andrew James Richmond Ward Trustee 23 January 2014
None on record
MS LOUISE NORMAN Trustee 17 April 2013
None on record
JONATHAN PAUL WOOD Trustee 14 November 2012
THE SERPENTINE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHRISTOPHER GABLE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Michael Robert Dixon Trustee 16 November 2011
None on record
SHIRLEY ANNE COEN Trustee 07 June 2011
THE DOREEN BIRD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Hilary Hadley Trustee
None on record
David William Grindrod Trustee
None on record