Accounts and annual returns UNITED CHURCH OF GOD BRITISH ISLES

Charity number: 1079192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 07 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 04 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 20 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window