Financial history SMART WORKS CHARITY

Charity number: 1080609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £579.20k £834.86k £1.42m £1.86m £1.74m
Total expenditure £671.96k £777.08k £1.13m £1.56m £1.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £397.61k £701.15k £682.28k £869.36k £1.24m
Income - Other trading activities £179.16k £131.71k £321.65k £544.69k £437.04k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.43k £2.01k £3.25k £3.43k £1.34k
Income - Other £0 £0 £413.33k £441.87k £63.43k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £641.88k £733.83k £973.52k £1.35m £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.08k £43.25k £157.09k £207.37k £181.45k
Expenditure - Governance £9.95k £2.65k £12.94k £10.88k £15.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0