Trustees SMART WORKS CHARITY

Charity number: 1080609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julietta Dexter Chair 29 April 2021
NCH AT NORTHEASTERN LIMITED
Received: On time
Simongnette Maria Theresa Scavazza Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Rachel Atkins Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Natalie Abou-Alwan Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Shepherdson Trustee 05 August 2019
None on record
Ewa Irena Kerin Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Claire Spencer-Churchill Trustee 31 January 2019
None on record
Tiffanie Jane Darke Trustee 31 January 2019
None on record
PHILIPPA CHARLES Trustee 12 October 2018
None on record