SILVERDALE ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.75k £2.85k £3.09k £3.75k £2.65k
Total expenditure £872 £5.43k £5.04k £1.25k £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A