Financial history SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1079550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.98k £5.99k £7.93k £4.69k £4.32k
Total expenditure £7.09k £6.21k £6.30k £4.26k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A