Financial history THE MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1083230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £4.33k £4.80k £33.07k £27.15k £42.30k
Total expenditure £4.10k £3.64k £7.80k £29.53k £32.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k N/A N/A