Trustees THE MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1083230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER SUTCLIFFE Chair 29 September 2014
None on record
Carol Royce Trustee 23 September 2019
MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP
Patricia Ann Wilson Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Russell Keith Goodall Trustee 06 March 2018
None on record
JILL USHER Trustee 30 September 2013
None on record
ANN SEWELL Trustee 30 September 1982
None on record