SCHOOL-HOME SUPPORT SERVICE (UK)

Charity number: 1084696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 09 June 2016 On time Download