BATTEN DISEASE FAMILY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 25 January 2017 On time Download