BATTEN DISEASE FAMILY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £328.51k £339.25k £442.25k £373.83k £274.41k
Total expenditure £451.80k £344.64k £506.30k £279.78k £279.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £4.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A