Accounts and annual returns EAST ANGLIAN AIR AMBULANCE

Charity number: 1083876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window