Financial history EAST ANGLIAN AIR AMBULANCE

Charity number: 1083876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £12.82m £13.13m £14.10m £14.83m £14.23m
Total expenditure £10.31m £10.64m £12.04m £13.02m £13.22m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £840.00k N/A £453.84k £420.13k £57.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.86m £7.12m £7.77m £7.92m £7.55m
Income - Other trading activities £5.52m £5.62m £5.91m £6.39m £6.35m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £425.94k £376.37k £357.86k £351.08k £233.49k
Income - Other £3.62k £10.80k £60.54k £169.24k £99.80k
Income - Legacies £3.00m £3.35m £3.49m £3.03m £3.47m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.48m £7.81m £8.98m £9.74m £10.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.83m £2.82m £3.06m £3.28m £2.81m
Expenditure - Governance £35.75k £41.86k £41.16k £46.91k £43.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £64.05k £64.71k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0