Trustees 1ST THORPE ST ANDREW (24TH NORWICH) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1082964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES RUMSBY | Chair | 06 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wegg | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alisha Lee | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Nunn | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica SNELL | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Framingham | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Court | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE KING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.