PHILANTHROPY IMPACT

Charity number: 1089157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lyn Tomlinson Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
DARSHITA GILLIES Trustee 05 June 2018
PLAN FOR PEACE Recently registered
Catherine Dovey Trustee 07 March 2016 None on record
George King IV CFA Trustee 05 June 2018
KING'S COLLEGE HOSPITAL CHARITY Received: On time
Jo Bateson Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
James Broderick Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
Edward Finch Trustee 13 September 2018 None on record
Rennie Hoare Chair 01 December 2018 None on record
Natasha Mueller Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
CERIS MARY GARDNER Trustee
NPT Transatlantic Limited Received: On time
CRIMESTOPPERS TRUST Received: On time
Richard Cassell Trustee 11 June 2020 None on record
Sarah Farrow Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
Nandu Patel Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record